EP0304974 - Alternator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.1992 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.1992 [1992/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holden, Karel Bleekhofstraat 27 B-2018 Antwerpen / BE | For all designated states Holdenova, Ladislava Bleekhofstraat 27 B-2018 Antwerpen / BE | [1989/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/09] | Representative(s) | Ottelohe, Jozef René Bureau Ottelohe J.R. Postbus 3 Fruithoflaan 105 2600 Antwerpen (Berchem) / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | Ottelohe, Jozef René Bureau Ottelohe J.R. Postbus 3 Fruithoflaan 105 B-2600 Antwerpen (Berchem) / BE | Application number, filing date | 88201547.2 | 18.07.1988 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | BE19870000892 | 10.08.1987 Original published format: BE 8700892 | [1989/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0304974 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02P9/40 | [1989/09] | CPC: |
H02K21/027 (EP,US);
H02K21/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/09] | Title | German: | Wechselstromgenerator | [1989/09] | English: | Alternator | [1989/09] | French: | Alternateur | [1989/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 08.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/21] | 23.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.08.1990 | 31.07.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1097551 ; | [A]DE726020 (DEMAG AG); | [A]DE929911 (DEMAG ZUG GMBH); | [A]DE1488273 (GARRETT CORP) |