EP0310166 - Stabilized crystalline polymer composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kluttz, Robert Quillin 15719 Sweetwater Creek Houston Texas 77095 / US | 02 /
Kemp, Richard Alan 11510 Chariot Stafford Texas 77477 / US | 03 /
Ryan, Robert Charles 214 Cove Ceeek Houston Texas 77042 / US | [1989/14] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1994/27] |
Former [1991/34] | Tuijn, Jan Warnaar, et al Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Intellectual Property Division P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1989/14] | Aalbers, Onno P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 88202016.7 | 14.09.1988 | [1989/14] | Priority number, date | US19870102467 | 29.09.1987 Original published format: US 102467 | [1989/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0310166 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0310166 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0310166 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/05, C08L73/00 | [1989/14] | CPC: |
C08G67/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/08 (KR);
C08K5/057 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/057, C08L73/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/14] | Title | German: | Stabilisierte kristalline Polymerzusammensetzung | [1989/14] | English: | Stabilized crystalline polymer composition | [1989/14] | French: | Composition de polymère cristalline stabilisée | [1989/14] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/37] | 03.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.07.1994 | BE | 06.07.1994 | CH | 06.07.1994 | ES | 06.07.1994 | GR | 06.07.1994 | LI | 06.07.1994 | NL | 06.07.1994 | SE | 06.10.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 06.07.1994 | |
BE | 06.07.1994 | ||
CH | 06.07.1994 | ||
GR | 06.07.1994 | ||
LI | 06.07.1994 | ||
NL | 06.07.1994 | ||
SE | 06.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 06.07.1994 | |
BE | 06.07.1994 | ||
CH | 06.07.1994 | ||
LI | 06.07.1994 | ||
NL | 06.07.1994 | ||
SE | 06.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 06.07.1994 | |
BE | 06.07.1994 | ||
CH | 06.07.1994 | ||
LI | 06.07.1994 | ||
NL | 06.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 06.07.1994 | |
BE | 06.07.1994 | ||
CH | 06.07.1994 | ||
LI | 06.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | BE | 06.07.1994 | |
CH | 06.07.1994 | ||
LI | 06.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | CH | 06.07.1994 | |
LI | 06.07.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58194937 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, no. 20, 14th May 1984, page 45, no. 157618p, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-58 194 937 (MITSUI POLYCHEMICALS CO., LTD) 14-11-1983, & JP58194937 A 00000000 |