EP0281223 - Secure messaging systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1992 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | ||
Former [1988/36] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marshall, Alan David 5 Trin Mills Merchants Landing Bristol BS 4RJ / GB | 02 /
Proudler, Graeme John 5 Touchstone Avenue Meade Park Stoke Gifford Bristol BS12 6XQ / GB | 03 /
Mitchell, Christopher John Manor House Cottage High Street Codford Warminster Wilts BA 12 ONE / GB | [1988/36] | Representative(s) | Squibbs, Robert Francis Hewlett-Packard Limited IP Section, Building 3 Filton Road Stoke Gifford, Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Squibbs, Robert Francis Hewlett-Packard Limited IP Section, Building 3 Filton Road Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | ||
Former [1988/36] | Squibbs, Robert Francis Hewlett-Packard Limited Cain Road Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1HN / GB | Application number, filing date | 88300365.9 | 18.01.1988 | [1988/36] | Priority number, date | GB19870004882 | 03.03.1987 Original published format: GB 8704882 | [1988/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0281223 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0281223 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0281223 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/16 | [1988/36] | CPC: |
H04N21/6377 (EP,US);
H04L1/1874 (EP,US);
H04L9/0836 (EP,US);
H04L9/0897 (EP,US);
H04L9/3242 (EP,US);
H04N21/658 (EP,US);
H04L2001/0093 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/36] | Title | German: | Sichere Datenaustauschsysteme | [1988/36] | English: | Secure messaging systems | [1988/36] | French: | Systèmes fiabilisés d'échanges de messages | [1988/36] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 10.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP59122251 ; | [Y]US3824547 (GREEN W, et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 243 (E-277)[1680], 8th November 1984; & JP-A-59 122 251 (NIPPON DENKI), & JP59122251 A 00000000 | [A] - C. MACCHI et al.: "Teleinformalique", 1983, chapter 4, pages 144-172, Dunod Paris, FR; "Protection contre les erreurs en téléinformatique" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 26, no. 1, June 1983, pages 199-201, New York, US; W.D. HOPKINS: "Transaction incrementing message authentication key" | [A] - NTC '78, CONFERENCE RECORD 1978 NATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, Birmingham, Alabama, US, 3rd - 6th December 1978, vol. 1, pages 4.5.1 - 4.5.5, IEEE, New York, US; M. BUTTO et al.: "Stability problems in packet switching networks with retransmission time-out" |