Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] |
15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
05.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.1992 [1992/17] |
16.03.1991 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.05.1991 [1991/18] |
22.11.1990 | Change - applicant | published on 09.01.1991 [1991/02] |
05.10.1990 | First examination report | |
15.05.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.07.1990 [1990/27] |
12.04.1990 | Publication of search report | published on 30.05.1990 [1990/22] |
23.07.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.09.1988 [1988/36] |