Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0281223 | Global Dossier | 02.05.1991 | B1 | EP0281223 | 30.05.1990 | A3 | EP0281223 | 07.09.1988 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB8704882 | 03.03.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3862594D1 | 06.06.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB8704882 | 03.03.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8704882D0 | 08.04.1987 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8704882 | 03.03.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2637456B | 06.08.1997 | B2 | JPS63226144 | 20.09.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8704882 | 03.03.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4866707 | 12.09.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8704882 | 03.03.1987 |