EP0297820 - Dispersible organoclay for unsaturated polyester resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.1995 [1995/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOUTHERN CLAY PRODUCTS, INC. 1212 Church Street Gonzales, TX 78629 / US | [1991/52] |
Former [1989/01] | For all designated states ECC INTERNATIONAL LIMITED John Keay House St. Austell Cornwall PL25 4DJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goodman, Howard 40 Turnavean Road St. Austell Cornwall / GB | 02 /
Smith, Douglas Neil 8 Polyear Close Polgooth St. Austell Cornwall / GB | 03 /
Dingle, Kathryn Beverley 29 Agar Road St. Austell Cornwall / GB | [1989/01] | Representative(s) | Green, Mark Charles, et al Murgitroyd & Company London Euston House 24 Eversholt Street London NW1 1AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | Green, Mark Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1993/10] | Pearce, Timothy Solvay Interox Limited Patent Department P.O. Box 51 Moorfield Road Widnes Cheshire WA8 0FE / GB | ||
Former [1989/01] | Bull, Michael Alan Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 88305856.2 | 28.06.1988 | [1989/01] | Priority number, date | US19870068850 | 01.07.1987 Original published format: US 68850 | [1989/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0297820 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0297820 | Date: | 13.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/34, C08K9/04, C08L67/06, C01B33/20, C09C1/42 | [1989/01] | CPC: |
C01B33/44 (EP,US);
C08K3/34 (KR);
C08K3/346 (EP,US);
C08K9/04 (KR);
C08L67/06 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/346, C08L67/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/01] | Title | German: | Dispergierbarer organophiler Ton für Harze von ungesättigten Polyestern | [1989/01] | English: | Dispersible organoclay for unsaturated polyester resin | [1989/01] | French: | Argile organophile dispersable pour résines à base de polyester insaturé | [1989/01] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 12.07.1988 | Examination requested [1989/01] | 23.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/26] | 02.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1994 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]HU35214 ; | [A]EP0215575 (ECC INT LTD [GB]) | [A] - WPIL, FILE SUPPLIER, accession no. 85-198578 [33], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & HU-A-35 214 (MTA MUSZAKI KEMIAI) 28-06-1985, & HU35214 A 00000000 |