|
28.04.1998 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1998 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1998 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1998 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1998 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1998 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
12 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
12 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.1997 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.1997 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.12.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.11.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.11.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.11.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.11.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1996 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1996 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
29 |
|
25.03.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.03.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
29 |
|
25.03.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.03.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
25.03.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
22.03.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
62 |
|
22.03.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
62 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1995 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1995 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1995 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.08.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.07.1995 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.1995 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.06.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
41 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
41 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
33 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
33 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1994 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.05.1994 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.05.1994 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.05.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.05.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.05.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.03.1994 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.1994 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1993 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.11.1993 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
134 |
|
29.09.1993 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.1993 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1993 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
15.03.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.03.1993 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.01.1993 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1993 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
10.10.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
10.10.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
10.10.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
31.07.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.08.1991 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.1991 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.08.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
26.08.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
26.08.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.08.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
17.04.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.08.1989 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.1989 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.1989 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1988 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1988 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.09.1988 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
01.09.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
01.09.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
84 |
|
01.09.1988 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.09.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.09.1988 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
01.09.1988 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
01.09.1988 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
01.09.1988 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
01.09.1988 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |