Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0307142
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
29.10.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
30.07.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] |
10.11.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
23.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] |
24.04.1998 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] |
08.01.1998 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
08.01.1998 |
Revocation of patent |
|
23.11.1996 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
28.03.1996 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
21.12.1995 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
07.07.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.1995 [1995/35] |
21.06.1995 |
Opposition filed |
published on 09.08.1995 [1995/32] |
01.06.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] |
29.07.1994 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] |
31.03.1993 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] |
12.04.1991 |
First examination report |
|
11.08.1989 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.09.1989 [1989/39] |
28.01.1989 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.03.1989 [1989/11] |