Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8721342D0 | 14.10.1987 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8721342 | 10.09.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8801758D0 | 24.02.1988 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8801758 | 27.01.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8812145D0 | 29.06.1988 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8812145 | 23.05.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8817311D0 | 24.08.1988 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8817311 | 20.07.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5405853 | 11.04.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8801758 | 27.01.1988 | US62112490 | 03.12.1990 | US94146192 | 08.09.1992 | GB8721342 | 10.09.1987 | GB8812145 | 23.05.1988 | GB8817311 | 20.07.1988 | US16665693 | 13.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA886578 | 26.07.1989 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8721342 | 10.09.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU626209B | Global Dossier | 23.07.1992 | B2 | AU2207388 | 16.03.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8801758 | 27.01.1988 | GB8721342 | 10.09.1987 | GB8812145 | 23.05.1988 | GB8817311 | 20.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0307142 | Global Dossier | 14.09.1994 | B1 | EP0307142 | 15.03.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8801758 | 27.01.1988 | GB8721342 | 10.09.1987 | GB8812145 | 23.05.1988 | GB8817311 | 20.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE111464T | 15.09.1994 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB8801758 | 27.01.1988 | GB8721342 | 10.09.1987 | GB8812145 | 23.05.1988 | GB8817311 | 20.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3851498T | 04.05.1995 | T2 | DE3851498D1 | 20.10.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB8801758 | 27.01.1988 | GB8721342 | 10.09.1987 | GB8812145 | 23.05.1988 | GB8817311 | 20.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK503188 | 01.05.1989 | A | DK503188D0 | 09.09.1988 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8801758 | 27.01.1988 | GB8721342 | 10.09.1987 | GB8812145 | 23.05.1988 | GB8817311 | 20.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL87643 | 30.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8801758 | 27.01.1988 | GB8721342 | 10.09.1987 | GB8812145 | 23.05.1988 | GB8817311 | 20.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH01104070 | 21.04.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8801758 | 27.01.1988 | GB8721342 | 10.09.1987 | GB8812145 | 23.05.1988 | GB8817311 | 20.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR890005103 | 11.05.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8801758 | 27.01.1988 | GB8721342 | 10.09.1987 | GB8812145 | 23.05.1988 | GB8817311 | 20.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ225999 | 28.04.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8801758 | 27.01.1988 | GB8721342 | 10.09.1987 | GB8812145 | 23.05.1988 | GB8817311 | 20.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT88422 | 30.10.1992 | B | PT88422 | 31.07.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8801758 | 27.01.1988 | GB8721342 | 10.09.1987 | GB8812145 | 23.05.1988 | GB8817311 | 20.07.1988 |