EP0307142 - Thiadiazoles useful in the treatment of senile dementia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERCK SHARP & DOHME LTD. Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9NU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states MERCK SHARP & DOHME LTD. Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9NU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baker, Raymond Bulls Cottage Green Tye Much Hadham Hertfordshire / GB | 02 /
Saunders, John 13 The Ridings Thorley Park Bishops Stortford Hertfordshire / GB | 03 /
MacLeod, Angus M. 27 Irving Close Thorley Park Bishops Stortford Hertfordshire / GB | 04 /
Merchant, Kevin 29 Red Lion Court Bishops Stortford Hertfordshire / GB | [1989/11] | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | Cole, William Gwyn European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [1989/11] | Hesketh, Alan, Dr. European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex, CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308127.5 | 01.09.1988 | [1989/11] | Priority number, date | GB19870021342 | 10.09.1987 Original published format: GB 8721342 | GB19880001758 | 27.01.1988 Original published format: GB 8801758 | GB19880012145 | 23.05.1988 Original published format: GB 8812145 | GB19880017311 | 20.07.1988 Original published format: GB 8817311 | [1989/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0307142 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307142 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/04, C07D453/02, C07D471/08, C07D487/08, A61K31/41, A61K31/44, A61K31/435 | [1989/11] | CPC: |
C07D417/04 (EP);
C07D471/08 (EP,KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07D453/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/11] | Title | German: | Thiadiazole, verwendbar zur Behandlung von altersbedingter Demenz | [1989/11] | English: | Thiadiazoles useful in the treatment of senile dementia | [1989/11] | French: | Thiadiazoles utilisables pour le traitement de la démence sénile | [1989/11] | Examination procedure | 02.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/39] | 17.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.1995
19.07.1995
ADMISSIBLE Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Secher, Anne c/o Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 02
13.06.1995
19.07.1995
ADMISSIBLE ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis IN 46285 / US Opponent's representative Crowther, Terence Roger Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.1995
19.07.1995
ADMISSIBLE Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Secher, Anne c/o Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
02
13.06.1995
19.07.1995
ADMISSIBLE Eli Lilly and Company Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis Indiana, 46285 / US Opponent's representative Crowther, Terence Roger Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | 13.09.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.03.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.06.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.06.1997 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1998/24] | 13.01.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.09.1994 | NL | 14.09.1994 | SE | 14.12.1994 | ES | 15.12.1994 | GR | 16.12.1994 | LU | 30.09.1995 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 14.09.1994 | |
NL | 14.09.1994 | ||
SE | 14.12.1994 | ||
ES | 15.12.1994 | ||
LU | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 14.09.1994 | |
CH | 14.09.1994 | ||
LI | 14.09.1994 | ||
NL | 14.09.1994 | ||
SE | 14.12.1994 | ||
LU | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 14.09.1994 | |
NL | 14.09.1994 | ||
SE | 14.12.1994 | ||
LU | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | AT | 14.09.1994 | |
NL | 14.09.1994 | ||
SE | 14.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 14.09.1994 | |
SE | 14.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2247266 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG); | EP0020161 [ ] (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | US4301069 [ ] (WEAVER MAX A, et al); | EP0018497 [ ]; | DE3038636 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]); | DE3422861 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]); | EP0261763 [ ] (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 76, No. 19, May 8, 1972, Columbus, Ohio, USA Z BIROVSKY, M. et al. "Organic Herbicides. V. Derivatives of 3-Mercapro-t-Amino-1,2,4-Thiadiazole." page 481, column 1, Abstract-No. 113 135k & Collect. Czech. Chem. Commun. 1971, 36(12), 4087-91 | Examination | EP0239309 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol 75, No.19, May 8 1972 & Coll. Czech Chem.Commun. 1971 36 (12), 4087-91 |