Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.05.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] |
11.10.1991 | First examination report | |
14.09.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.10.1990 [1990/44] |
10.03.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.04.1990 [1990/17] |