Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0323163
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
12.11.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |
02.04.1992 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.05.1992 [1992/21] |
17.12.1991 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.02.1992 [1992/06] |
07.12.1991 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.01.1992 [1992/05] |
26.11.1991 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.1992 [1992/03] |
26.10.1991 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] |
12.04.1991 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.05.1991 [1991/22] |
07.05.1990 |
First examination report |
|
14.09.1989 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.11.1989 [1989/44] |
20.05.1989 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.07.1989 [1989/27] |