Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE63941T | 15.06.1991 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP88312229 | 22.12.1988 | US13833287 | 28.12.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0323163 | Global Dossier | 29.05.1991 | B1 | EP0323163 | 05.07.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13833287 | 28.12.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1301736 | 26.05.1992 | C | Priority number | Date | US13833287 | 28.12.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3863066D1 | 04.07.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US13833287 | 28.12.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2022637 | 01.12.1991 | B3 | Priority number | Date | US13833287 | 28.12.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2613284B | 21.05.1997 | B2 | JPH01259096 | 16.10.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US13833287 | 28.12.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4795583 | 03.01.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US13833287 | 28.12.1987 |