Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] |
28.02.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] |
05.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1992 [1992/52] |
15.11.1991 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.01.1992 [1992/01] |
24.10.1989 | First examination report | |
24.09.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] |
24.09.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] |