Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE71106T | 15.01.1992 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3715869 | 07.05.1987 | EP88730106 | 06.05.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3867301D1 | 13.02.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3867301 | 06.05.1988 | DE3715869 | 07.05.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0290378 | Global Dossier | 02.01.1992 | B1 | EP0290378 | 09.11.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3715869 | 07.05.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3715869 | 03.05.1989 | C2 | DE3715869 | 17.11.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3715869 | 07.05.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2037871T | 01.07.1993 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE3715869 | 07.05.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3003700T | 16.03.1993 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE3715869 | 07.05.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS63287796 | 24.11.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3715869 | 07.05.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4871482 | 03.10.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3715869 | 07.05.1987 |