Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0298944 | Global Dossier | 16.05.1990 | A3 | EP0298944 | 11.01.1989 | A2 | Priority number | Date | SE8702823 | 09.07.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE458402 | 20.03.1989 | B | SE8702823L | 10.01.1989 | L | SE8702823D0 | 09.07.1987 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE8702823 | 09.07.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4935587 | 19.06.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | SE8702823 | 09.07.1987 |