Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] |
12.08.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.09.1993 [1993/39] |
19.03.1993 | First examination report | |
18.10.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.12.1991 [1991/49] |
26.02.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 17.04.1991 [1991/16] |
29.07.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.09.1989 [1989/37] |