Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU603284B | Global Dossier | 08.11.1990 | B2 | AU2986789 | 07.09.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US16495788 | 07.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0332132 | Global Dossier | 29.09.1993 | B1 | EP0332132 | 17.04.1991 | A3 | EP0332132 | 13.09.1989 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US16495788 | 07.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1305644 | 28.07.1992 | C | Priority number | Date | US16495788 | 07.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1023196C | 22.12.1993 | C | CN1038966 | 24.01.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US16495788 | 07.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE68909450T | 21.04.1994 | T2 | DE68909450D1 | 04.11.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US16495788 | 07.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2045221T | 16.01.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US16495788 | 07.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2923299B | 26.07.1999 | B2 | JPH01283401 | 15.11.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US16495788 | 07.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4798527 | 17.01.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US16495788 | 07.03.1988 |