EP0332132 - Electrohydraulic servo system, especially for injection molding machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vickers Incorporated 1401 Crooks Road Troy Michigan 48084 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | For all designated states Vickers Incorporated 1401 Crooks Road Troy Michigan 48084 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gunda, Rajamouli 679 Rutgers Road Rochester Hills Michagan 48309 / US | [1989/37] | Representative(s) | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Sonnenberger Strasse 100 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Sonnenberger Strasse 100 D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 89103985.1 | 07.03.1989 | [1989/37] | Priority number, date | US19880164957 | 07.03.1988 Original published format: US 164957 | [1989/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0332132 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0332132 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0332132 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/82 | [1989/37] | CPC: |
B29C45/77 (EP,US);
B29C45/82 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7759 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7761 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/37] | Title | German: | Elektrohydraulisches Steuersystem, insbesondere für Spritzgussmaschinen | [1989/37] | English: | Electrohydraulic servo system, especially for injection molding machines | [1989/37] | French: | Système servocommande électro-hydraulique notamment pour presses d'injections | [1989/37] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 24.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0074320 (COOPELIN SARL [FR]); | [A]DE3447709 (HEHL KARL); | [A]US4411609 (YOSHII MASAKI [JP], et al); | [A]US4164167 (IMAI ISAO [JP], et al); | [A]DE3501846 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0135652 (KLOECKNER WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0093348 (VICKERS INC [US]) |