EP0354507 - Process for producing des-B30 insulins and derivatives thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 24.12.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/07] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grünwald, Wolfgang Danziger Allee 110b D-6203 Hochheim / DE | 02 /
Müller-Lehar, Jürgen, Dr. 75, Hatheway Drive West Warwick RI 02893 / US | 03 /
Worm, Manfred, Dr. Erbsenacker 27 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1990/07] | Application number, filing date | 89114522.9 | 07.08.1989 | [1990/07] | Priority number, date | DE19883827121 | 10.08.1988 Original published format: DE 3827121 | [1990/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0354507 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0354507 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0354507 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/12, C07K7/40, // C07K99:26 | [1990/07] | CPC: |
C07K14/62 (EP);
C12P21/00 (KR);
A61P3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LU, NL [1990/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Des-B30-Insulinen und Des-B30-Insulinderivaten | [1990/07] | English: | Process for producing des-B30 insulins and derivatives thereof | [1990/07] | French: | Procédé pour obtenir une des-B30 insuline et ses dérivés | [1990/07] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 16.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.1994
20.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE Novo Industri A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.1994
20.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE Novo Industri A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | 03.08.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.02.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 18.02.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.05.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.09.1997 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 22.09.1997 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1998/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.10.1993 | ES | 06.10.1993 | FR | 06.10.1993 | GB | 06.10.1993 | GR | 06.10.1993 | IT | 06.10.1993 | NL | 06.10.1993 | AT | 07.08.1996 | LU | 07.08.1996 | DE | 01.05.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/38] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
ES | 06.10.1993 | ||
GB | 06.10.1993 | ||
GR | 06.10.1993 | ||
IT | 06.10.1993 | ||
NL | 06.10.1993 | ||
FR | 25.02.1994 | ||
AT | 07.08.1996 | ||
LU | 07.08.1996 | ||
DE | 01.05.1997 | ||
Former [2002/24] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
ES | 06.10.1993 | ||
GB | 06.10.1993 | ||
GR | 06.10.1993 | ||
IT | 06.10.1993 | ||
NL | 06.10.1993 | ||
FR | 25.02.1994 | ||
AT | 07.08.1996 | ||
LU | 31.08.1996 | ||
DE | 01.05.1997 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
GB | 06.10.1993 | ||
GR | 06.10.1993 | ||
IT | 06.10.1993 | ||
NL | 06.10.1993 | ||
FR | 25.02.1994 | ||
AT | 07.08.1996 | ||
LU | 31.08.1996 | ||
DE | 01.05.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
GB | 06.10.1993 | ||
IT | 06.10.1993 | ||
NL | 06.10.1993 | ||
FR | 25.02.1994 | ||
AT | 07.08.1996 | ||
DE | 01.05.1997 | ||
Former [1997/43] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
GB | 06.10.1993 | ||
NL | 06.10.1993 | ||
FR | 25.02.1994 | ||
AT | 07.08.1996 | ||
DE | 01.05.1997 | ||
Former [1997/28] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
GB | 06.10.1993 | ||
NL | 06.10.1993 | ||
FR | 25.02.1994 | ||
AT | 07.08.1996 | ||
Former [1995/02] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
GB | 06.10.1993 | ||
NL | 06.10.1993 | ||
FR | 25.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/41] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
GB | 06.10.1993 | ||
NL | 06.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
NL | 06.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/38] | BE | 06.10.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU469686 | [A] - NATURE, Band 280, 1979, Seiten 412-413, London, GB; K. MORIHARA et al.: "Semi-synthesis of human insulin by trypsin-catalysed replacement of AlA-B30 by Thr in porcine insulin" |