Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.1994 [1994/27] |
27.05.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] |
04.09.1991 | First examination report | |
14.08.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.10.1990 [1990/40] |
12.03.1990 | Publication of search report | published on 02.05.1990 [1990/18] |
17.06.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] |