EP0326280 - Cutting apparatus for sheet-like materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.1994 [1994/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/31] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 1-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Hidetoshi c/o Technical Center Bridgestone Corp. 1-1, Ogawahigashi-Cho 3-chome Kodaira City Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Toya, Hiroki c/o Technical Center Bridgestone Corp. 1-1, Ogawahigashi-Cho 3-chome Kodaira City Tokyo / JP | [1989/31] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/31] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89300452.3 | 18.01.1989 | [1989/31] | Priority number, date | JP19880006788 | 18.01.1988 Original published format: JP 678888 | [1989/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0326280 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0326280 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0326280 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/46 | [1989/31] | CPC: |
B29D30/46 (EP,US);
B29D2030/466 (EP,US);
Y10T83/173 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7768 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7776 (EP,US);
Y10T83/8773 (EP,US);
Y10T83/8822 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1989/31] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Schneiden von bahnförmigem Material | [1989/31] | English: | Cutting apparatus for sheet-like materials | [1989/31] | French: | Dispositif pour la découpe de matériaux en forme de feuilles | [1989/31] | Examination procedure | 08.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 09.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3207019 (MARCELLO VANZO, et al); | [A]US3762259 (KUTS M); | [A]US4070939 (NEUMEISTER ALVIN W); | [A]US4667550 (EITING JOHN C [US]); | [A]FR1470761 (SCHLOEMANN AG) |