EP0329341 - Capillary electrophoresis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLIED BIOSYSTEMS, INC. 850 Lincoln Centre Drive Foster City California 94404 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | For all designated states APPLIED BIOSYSTEMS, INC. 850 Lincoln Centre Drive Foster City California 94404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lauer, Henk H. 2707 Ponce Avenue Belmont California 94002 / US | 02 /
Grossman, Paul D. 590 Avocet Drive, No. 720 Redway City California 97065 / US | 03 /
Mead, Dennis E. 1495 McBain Avenue Campbell California 95008 / US | [1989/34] | Representative(s) | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89301280.7 | 10.02.1989 | [1989/34] | Priority number, date | US19880156430 | 16.02.1988 Original published format: US 156430 | [1989/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0329341 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0329341 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0329341 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/26 | [1989/34] | CPC: |
G01N27/44756 (EP);
G01N27/44743 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1989/34] | Title | German: | Kapillare Elektrophorese | [1989/34] | English: | Capillary electrophoresis | [1989/34] | French: | Electrophorèse capillaire | [1989/34] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/31] | 21.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3712776 (HELENA LAB CORP [US]) | [AD] - ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 59, no. 4, 15th February 1987, pages 678-681, Washington, DC, US; R.A. WALLINGFORD et al.: "Characterization of a microinjector for capillary zone electrophoresis" |