Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] |
10.03.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.04.1995 [1995/17] |
15.04.1993 | First examination report | |
10.06.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.07.1991 [1991/31] |
15.10.1990 | Publication of search report | published on 05.12.1990 [1990/49] |
08.07.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.08.1989 [1989/34] |