EP0351132 - Optical crossover network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1990/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jahns, Jurgen 194 Garden Road Shrewsbury New Jersey 07702 / US | 02 /
Murdocca, Miles Joseph RD No 4, 380 Jackson New Jersey 08527 / US | [1995/39] |
Former [1990/03] | 01 /
Jahns, Jurgen 194 Garden Road Shrewsbury New jersey 07702 / US | ||
02 /
Murdocca, Miles Joseph RD No, 4 380 Jackson New Jersey 08527 / US | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89306856.9 | 06.07.1989 | [1990/03] | Priority number, date | US19880219623 | 15.07.1988 Original published format: US 219623 | [1990/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351132 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351132 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0351132 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/10, H04Q3/52 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
G02B27/106 (EP,US);
G02B27/10 (KR);
G02B27/144 (EP,US);
G02B27/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/03] | Title | German: | Optisches Teiler-Netzwerk | [1995/39] | English: | Optical crossover network | [1990/03] | French: | Réseau optique de distribution croisé | [1995/39] |
Former [1990/03] | Gekreuztes optisches Netzwerk | ||
Former [1990/03] | Réseau optique croisé | Examination procedure | 21.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/43] | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP60002920 [ ]; | JP57192921 [ ]; | [A]WO8700314 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]DE8814391U | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 116 (P-357)[1839]; & JP-A-60 002 920 (YAMAICHI DENKI KOGYO K.K.) 09-01-1985, Abstract; figure., & JP60002920 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 42 (P-177)[1187], 19th February 1983; & JP-A-57 192 921 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 27-11-1982, Abstract; figure., & JP57192921 A 00000000 | [ ] - AT&T TECHNICAL JOURNAL, vol. 66, no. 3, May/June 1987, pages 41-53, Short Hills, NJ, US; H.S. HINTON: "Photonic switching technology applications", page 49, left-hand column, paragraph 3 - page 52, right-hand column, paragraph 2; figures 5, 8, 10, 11. |