EP0334828 - Combustion apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.1992 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.1992 [1992/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INGENIÖRSFIRMAN PETROKRAFT AB Gräddgatan 12 S-411 25 Göteborg / SE | [1989/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nielsen, Heine Karl Gustavsgatan 2 S-411 25 Göteborg / SE | [1989/39] | Representative(s) | Wallin, Bo-Göran, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | Wallin, Bo-Göran, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 89850098.8 | 23.03.1989 | [1989/39] | Priority number, date | SE19880001107 | 24.03.1988 Original published format: SE 8801107 | [1989/39] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0334828 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0334828 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F23J15/00, F23M9/00 | [1989/39] | CPC: |
F23J15/02 (EP);
F23M9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/39] | Title | German: | Verbrennungsgerät | [1989/39] | English: | Combustion apparatus | [1989/39] | French: | Appareil à combustion | [1989/39] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 22.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/45] | 09.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.05.1989 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   26.05.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP53029273 ; | [Y]JP52049971 ; | [Y]WO8706853 ; | [Y]DE3441141 ; | [AD]SE436791 ; | [A]FR2290635 ; | [A]US3900554 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2, no. 72, 31st May 1978, page 815 C 78; & JP-A-53 029 273 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K.) 18-03-1978, & JP53029273 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 91, 24th August 1977, page 1871 C 77; & JP-A-52 049 971 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K.) 21-04-1977, & JP52049971 A 00000000 |