Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE58904288D1 | 09.06.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP8900091 | 02.02.1989 | DE58904288 | 02.02.1989 | DE3808724 | 16.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8908571 | Global Dossier | 21.09.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3808724 | 16.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0404780 | Global Dossier | 05.05.1993 | B1 | EP0404780 | 02.01.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3808724 | 16.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3808724 | 05.10.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3808724 | 16.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH03503038 | 11.07.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3808724 | 16.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5085489 | 04.02.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3808724 | 16.03.1988 |