EP0404780 - AUTOMATIC ANTISKID SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1991/01] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMIG, Reiner Geislinger Weg 27 D-7146 Tamm / DE | 02 /
POLITZ, Werner Lohlenbachweg 27 D-7250 Leonberg / DE | [1991/01] | Representative(s) | Kammer, Arno ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | Kammer, Arno, Dipl.-Ing. ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 89902247.9 | 02.02.1989 | [1991/01] | WO1989EP00091 | Priority number, date | DE19883808724 | 16.03.1988 Original published format: DE 3808724 | [1991/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8908571 | Date: | 21.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0404780 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0404780 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00, B60T17/00, B60R16/02 | [1991/01] | CPC: |
B60T8/1708 (EP,US);
B60T8/323 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/01] | Title | German: | ANTIBLOCKIERREGELSYSTEM | [1991/01] | English: | AUTOMATIC ANTISKID SYSTEM | [1991/01] | French: | SYSTEME DE REGLAGE ANTIBLOCAGE | [1991/01] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.1990 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 04.07.1990 | Examination requested [1991/01] | 04.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.05.1993 | GB | 05.05.1993 | IT | 05.05.1993 | SE | 05.05.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 05.05.1993 | |
IT | 05.05.1993 | ||
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
FR | 24.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/24] | GB | 05.05.1993 | |
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
FR | 24.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | GB | 05.05.1993 | |
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/02] | SE | 05.05.1993 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3955652 (NILSSON STURE NILS, et al) |