EP0401462 - Process for making and/or handling concrete blocks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.08.1993 [1993/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metten Produktions- und Handels GmbH Industriegebiet Hammermühle D-51491 Overath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/50] | For all designated states METTEN PRODUKTIONS- UND HANDELS GMBH Industriegebiet Hammermühle D-51491 Overath / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Metten, Josef Mutzerstrasse 21 D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 2 / DE | 02 /
Metten, Hans-Josef, Dipl.-Betriebswirt Mutzerstr. 21a D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 2 / DE | [1990/50] | Representative(s) | Nau, Walter Patentanwalt Johann-Pullem-Strasse 8 50999 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/50] | Nau, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. Johann-Pullem-Strasse 8 D-50999 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 90101272.4 | 23.01.1990 | [1990/50] | Priority number, date | DE19893918271 | 05.06.1989 Original published format: DE 3918271 | [1990/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0401462 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0401462 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B28B11/08 | [1990/50] | CPC: |
B28D1/185 (EP,US);
B28B11/0818 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen und/oder Behandeln von Betonsteinen | [1990/50] | English: | Process for making and/or handling concrete blocks | [1990/50] | French: | Procédé de fabrication et/ou de traitement de blocs en béton | [1990/50] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 17.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.02.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2426205 (STETTER GMBH); | [X]GB468234 (DUNCAN WHITEHOUSE, et al); | [Y]GB656589 (EASTWOODS LTD); | [A]FR586196 ; | [A]FR2468566 (AYELLA DENIS [FR]); | [A]DE2442070 (GERHAHER MAX); | [A]US4229156 (HYYTINEN NIILO M) |