EP0384164 - Locking device for disc drive shafts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.1993 [1993/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DATEV DATENVERARBEITUNGSORGANISATION DES STEUERBERATENDEN BERUFES IN DER BUNDESREPUBLIK DEUTSCHLAND EG Sigmundstrasse 172 D-90431 Nürnberg / DE | [1990/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Norbert Fürther Strasse 83 D-8500 Nürnberg 80 / DE | [1990/35] | Representative(s) | Matschkur, Lindner, Blaumeier Postfach 11 91 09 90101 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | Matschkur, Götz, Lindner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 91 09 D-90101 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90101746.7 | 29.01.1990 | [1990/35] | Priority number, date | DE19893905647 | 24.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3905647 | [1990/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0384164 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0384164 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/28, G11B23/00, G11B23/03 | [1990/35] | CPC: |
G11B23/287 (EP);
G11B33/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1990/35] | Title | German: | Sperrvorrichtung für Diskettenlaufwerk-Schächte | [1990/35] | English: | Locking device for disc drive shafts | [1990/35] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage pour orifice de chargement d'unité d'entraînement de disques | [1990/35] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.08.1990 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 30.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 16.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.1992 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/46] | 21.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4794587 ; | [XP]DE8908421U ; | [XP]DE3733658 ; | [XP]US4856304 ; | [XP]WO8909993 ; | [A]DE8713331U ; | [A]DE8528552U ; | [A]EP0165702 ; | [A]US4131001 |