Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0389852
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.05.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] |
28.06.1996 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] |
07.07.1995 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] |
05.01.1994 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] |
20.10.1993 |
First examination report |
|
30.07.1992 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.09.1992 [1992/38] |
17.12.1991 |
Publication of search report |
published on 05.02.1992 [1992/06] |
18.08.1990 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.10.1990 [1990/40] |