EP0417815 - Method and apparatus for applying a selected pattern of work material on a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | ||
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | ||
Former [1991/12] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keller, Richard Francis Box 113 High St. Fremont, WI 54940 / US | 02 /
Springer, Terry Lee 834 Broad St. Menasha, WI 54952 / US | 03 /
Jeanquart, Jeffrey J. 212 Edgewood Dr. Neenah, WI 54915 / US | [1991/12] | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al Diehl & Partner GbR Postfach 34 01 15 80098 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/12] | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., Dr., et al Diehl, Glaeser, Hiltl & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90117773.3 | 14.09.1990 | [1991/12] | Priority number, date | US19890408019 | 15.09.1989 Original published format: US 408019 | [1991/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0417815 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0417815 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0417815 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D04H3/05 | [1991/12] | CPC: |
B05C5/02 (EP,US);
D04H3/05 (EP,KR,US);
D04H3/16 (EP,US);
B05B7/0861 (EP,US);
B05B7/10 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1798 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage für die Auftragung der ausgesuchten Muster auf einer Grundlage | [1991/12] | English: | Method and apparatus for applying a selected pattern of work material on a substrate | [1991/12] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'application d'un motif sélectionné d'un matériau préparé sur un support | [1991/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/47] | 24.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE SCA MOLNLYCKE AB 405 03 Goteborg / SE Opponent's representative Harrison, Michael Charles Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [1996/50] | 21.11.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.03.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.10.1998 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.10.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.1998 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.11.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.06.1999 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.1996 | CH | 17.01.1996 | DK | 17.01.1996 | GR | 17.01.1996 | LI | 17.01.1996 | LU | 30.09.1996 | [2000/04] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 17.01.1996 | |
CH | 17.01.1996 | ||
DK | 17.01.1996 | ||
LI | 17.01.1996 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 17.01.1996 | |
CH | 17.01.1996 | ||
LI | 17.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 17.01.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2112416 (LUTRAVIL SPINNVLIES); | [YD]US3911173 (SPRAGUE JR GORDON V); | [A]FR2295153 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |