EP0420184 - Video signal processing circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagino, Hideyuki, c/o Intellectual Property Div. Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90118466.3 | 26.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | JP19890249075 | 27.09.1989 Original published format: JP 24907589 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0420184 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0420184 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0420184 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/78 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
H04N9/78 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/14] | Title | German: | Videosignalverarbeitungsschaltung | [1991/14] | English: | Video signal processing circuit | [1991/14] | French: | Circuit de traitement de signal vidéo | [1991/14] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 18.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP1143487 ; | [A]JP55150688 ; | [A]JP58123285 ; | [A]US4072984 (KAISER ARTHUR); | [A]US4809060 (SAEKI TOMOKI [JP]); | [A]EP0311461 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]US4845547 (NAIMPALLY SAIPRASAD V [US]); | [A]EP0322890 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4862252 (KURODA KAZUO [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 401 (E-816)(3749) 6 September 1989 & JP-A-1 143 487 ( CANON ) 6 June 1989, & JP1143487 A 19890606 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 23 (E-45)(695) 12 February 1981 & JP-A-55 150 688 ( SONY ) 22 November 1980, & JP55150688 A 19801122 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 233 (E-204)(1378) 15 October 1983 & JP-A-58 123 285 ( PIONEER ) 22 July 1983, & JP58123285 A 19830722 |