EP0421331 - Developer carrying member, developing device, and device unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuribayashi, Tetsuya, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/15] | Representative(s) | Bühling, Gerhard, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/15] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90118826.8 | 01.10.1990 | [1991/15] | Priority number, date | JP19890255184 | 02.10.1989 Original published format: JP 25518489 | JP19890257651 | 04.10.1989 Original published format: JP 25765189 | [1991/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0421331 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0421331 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0421331 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/09 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
G03G15/0928 (EP,US);
G03G15/0818 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0614 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0641 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1355 (EP,US);
Y10T428/139 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/15] | Title | German: | Entwickler-Trägerelement, Entwicklungsvorrichtung und Einheit mit dieser Vorrichtung | [1991/15] | English: | Developer carrying member, developing device, and device unit | [1991/15] | French: | Elément porteur de développateur, dispositif de développement et unité comprenant ce dispositif | [1991/15] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/15] | 27.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4034709 (FRASER LAWRENCE J, et al); | [Y]US4057666 (DRUMMOND JR ARTHUR); | [Y]US4616918 (KOHYAMA MITSUAKI [JP], et al); | [XP]EP0339944 (CANON KK [JP]) |