Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] |
27.05.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 13.07.1994 [1994/28] |
05.01.1994 | Change - representative | published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] |
23.11.1992 | First examination report | |
03.09.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] |
23.02.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.04.1991 [1991/15] |
23.02.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.04.1991 [1991/15] |