EP0427118 - Jumping safety gear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1994 [1994/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Schlauchbootfabrik Hans Scheibert GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 1169 37628 Eschershausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | For all designated states Deutsche Schlauchbootfabrik Hans Scheibert GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 1169 D-37628 Eschershausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lorsbach, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Schwertstrasse 59 W-5650 Solingen 1 / DE | 02 /
Gemeinhardt, Werner Bruchweg 22 W-3456 Eschershausen / DE | [1991/20] | Representative(s) | Depmeyer, Lothar Auf der Höchte 30 30823 Garbsen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | Depmeyer, Lothar Auf der Höchte 30 D-30823 Garbsen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90120974.2 | 02.11.1990 | [1991/20] | Priority number, date | DE19893937401 | 10.11.1989 Original published format: DE 3937401 | [1991/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0427118 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0427118 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A62B1/22, A47C27/08 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
A62B1/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/20] | Title | German: | Sprungrettungsgerät | [1991/20] | English: | Jumping safety gear | [1991/20] | French: | Dispositif permettant le sauvetage par le saut | [1991/20] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 03.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2797853 (FRANK JAMES); | [A]US3899797 (GUNST DENNIS); | [A]DE8814720U |