Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.12.1992 | Refusal of application | published on 27.01.1993 [1993/04] |
06.04.1992 | First examination report | |
16.05.1991 | Change - language of procedure | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] |
16.05.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] |
16.05.1991 | Change - representative | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] |
26.09.1990 | Publication of search report | published on 14.11.1990 [1990/46] |
16.06.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.08.1990 [1990/31] |