Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0380335 | Global Dossier | 14.11.1990 | A3 | EP0380335 | 01.08.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB8901837 | 27.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2008560 | 27.07.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8901837 | 27.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8901837D0 | 15.03.1989 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8901837 | 27.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT92966 | 31.07.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8901837 | 27.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5075102 | 24.12.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8901837 | 27.01.1989 |