EP0380335 - Sun tan accelerator compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.12.1992 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1992 | Refusal of application | published on 27.01.1993 [1993/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANCASTER SOCIETE ANONYME MONEGASQUE Stade Louis II, Entrée F Monaco / MC | [1990/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hubaud, Jean-Claude Pelleautier F-05000 Gap / FR | 02 /
Thiry, Daniele Les Amaryllis, 379 Chemin Du Serrier F-06320 La Turbie / FR | [1990/31] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt Postfach 40 14 68 D-80714 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/31] | West, Vivien SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 90300773.0 | 25.01.1990 | [1990/31] | Priority number, date | GB19890001837 | 27.01.1989 Original published format: GB 8901837 | [1990/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0380335 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0380335 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/42 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/365 (EP,US);
A61K8/4953 (EP,US);
A61K8/585 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/31] | Title | German: | Mittel zur Förderung der Hautbräunung | [1990/31] | English: | Sun tan accelerator compositions | [1990/31] | French: | Compositions accélérant le bronzage | [1990/31] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 10.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/04] | 31.08.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4145413 (USDIN VERA R, et al); | [Y]US4349536 (HAUSLER KENNETH J); | [Y]FR2611496 (GUEYNE JEAN [MC], et al) | [YD] - Cosmetics & Toiletries, Vol. 102, March 1987, pages 97-101, Allured Publishing Corp.; M. DUGGAN et al.: "Tyrosinase...The enzyme behind the tan", page 100, point 3. |