EP0439970 - Slotted wave guide radiator with non-inclined slots excited by conductive printed patterns [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/07] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caer, Daniel THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | 02 /
Le Foll, Jean THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | 03 /
Roger, Joseph THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Albert, Claude, et al THALES Intellectual Property 31-33, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | Albert, Claude, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue J.P. Timbaud F-92402 COURBEVOIE CEDEX / FR | Application number, filing date | 90403194.5 | 09.11.1990 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | FR19890014896 | 14.11.1989 Original published format: FR 8914896 | [1991/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0439970 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0439970 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q21/00 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
H01Q21/0043 (EP,US);
H01Q13/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, GB, IT, SE [1991/32] | Title | German: | Geschlitzter Hohlleiterstrahler mit quer verlaufenden Schlitzen, die von gedruckten, leitenden Mustern erregt werden | [1991/32] | English: | Slotted wave guide radiator with non-inclined slots excited by conductive printed patterns | [1991/32] | French: | Guide à fentes rayonnantes non inclinées à excitation par des motifs conducteurs imprimés rayonnants | [1991/32] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 12.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 28.12.1994 | ES | 28.12.1994 | [2002/25] |
Former [1998/15] | DK | 28.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2574433 (CLAPP ROGER E); | [A]US3176300 (KUECKEN JOHN A); | [Y]US3806945 (PROCTOR D); | [A]US4303923 (BITTER JR CHARLES R, et al); | [Y]EP0048817 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) |