EP0455652 - FOOTBED OF A SHOE IN THE FORM OF A SEPARATE FOOTBED INSERT OR OF A FOOTBED PART CONNECTED TO A SHOE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JÜRGENS, Ute Frankstrasse 27 D-50676 Köln / DE | [1991/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/46] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Wulf Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Bauer, Wulf, Dr. Bayenthalgürtel 15 D-50968 Köln (Marienburg) / DE | ||
Former [1991/46] | Bauer, Wulf, Dr. Bayenthalgürtel 15 W-5000 Köln 51 (Marienburg) / DE | Application number, filing date | 90901742.8 | 24.01.1990 | [1991/46] | WO1990DE00042 | Priority number, date | DE19893902207 | 26.01.1989 Original published format: DE 3902207 | [1991/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9008486 | Date: | 09.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0455652 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0455652 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A43B7/00, // A61F5/14 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
A43B13/181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/46] | Title | German: | FUSSBETT EINES SCHUHS IN FORM EINER SEPARATEN FUSSBETTEINLAGE ODER EINES MIT EINEM SCHUH VERBUNDENEN FUSSBETTTEILS | [1991/46] | English: | FOOTBED OF A SHOE IN THE FORM OF A SEPARATE FOOTBED INSERT OR OF A FOOTBED PART CONNECTED TO A SHOE | [1991/46] | French: | SEMELLE INTERIEURE POUR CHAUSSURE, SEPAREE OU INTEGREE DANS LA CHAUSSURE | [1991/46] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 29.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/46] | 19.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4109661 (FUKUOKA TATSUO); | [X]GB1553415 (FUKUOKA T); | [X]GB2046579 (TAKAOKA S) |