Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.06.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] |
30.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] |
12.08.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.09.1993 [1993/39] |
24.03.1993 | Change - representative | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] |
13.08.1992 | First examination report | |
27.09.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.11.1991 [1991/46] |
27.09.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.11.1991 [1991/46] |