Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE95042T | 15.10.1993 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE9000042 | 24.01.1990 | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59002949D1 | 04.11.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE9000042 | 24.01.1990 | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI92458C | 25.11.1994 | C | FI92458B | 15.08.1994 | B | Priority number | Date | DE9000042 | 24.01.1990 | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9008486 | Global Dossier | 09.08.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0455652 | Global Dossier | 29.09.1993 | B1 | EP0455652 | 13.11.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2050912 | 27.07.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1044392 | 08.08.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ279812 | 12.07.1995 | B6 | CS9000358A2 | 17.12.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DD298738 | 12.03.1992 | A5 | Priority number | Date | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3902207 | 02.08.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0455652T | 18.04.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2045901T | 16.01.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR1000287 | 12.05.1992 | B | GR900100039 | 07.06.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU212013 | 29.01.1996 | B | HUT60116 | 28.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH04503315 | 18.06.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL162207B | 30.09.1993 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT92948 | 31.01.1996 | B | PT92948 | 31.07.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK278284B | 07.08.1996 | B6 | Priority number | Date | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5251387 | 12.10.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3902207 | 26.01.1989 |