Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0414838 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2004 | B2 | EP0414838 | 22.09.1993 | B1 | EP0414838 | 06.03.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9000143 | 26.01.1990 | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE95014T | 15.10.1993 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP9000143 | 26.01.1990 | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59002822D1 | 28.10.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 | DE59002822 | 26.01.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0414838T | 02.08.2004 | T4 | DK0414838T | 01.11.1993 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP9000143 | 26.01.1990 | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI101252B | 15.05.1998 | B1 | FI101252B | 15.05.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | EP9000143 | 26.01.1990 | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0140877B | 01.07.1998 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP9000143 | 26.01.1990 | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9009063 | Global Dossier | 09.08.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2026441 | 11.10.1994 | C | CA2026441 | 02.08.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DD292791 | 08.08.1991 | A5 | Priority number | Date | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3902948 | 09.08.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2045902T | 16.11.2004 | T5 | ES2045902T | 16.01.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK55296 | 03.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU208203 | 30.08.1993 | B | HUT56473 | 28.08.1991 | A | HU901222D0 | 29.07.1991 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3226537B | 05.11.2001 | B2 | JPH03503829 | 22.08.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY105226 | 30.08.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR24444 | 01.11.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5214742 | 25.05.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3902948 | 01.02.1989 |