EP0414838 - PROCESS FOR TRANSMITTING A SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Consumer Electronics Sales GmbH Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | [2000/33] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states Thomson Consumer Electronics Sales GmbH Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states TELEFUNKEN FERNSEH UND RUNDFUNK GMBH Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDLER, Bernd Hemelingstrasse, 10 D-3000 Hannover / DE | [1991/10] | Representative(s) | Hartnack, Wolfgang, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | Hartnack, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Licensing & Intellectual Property, Göttinger Chaussee 76 30453 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1995/04] | Wördemann, Hermes, Dipl.-Ing., et al Thomson Consumer Electronics Sales GmbH Postfach 91 13 45 D-30433 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1991/10] | Einsel, Robert, Dipl.-Ing. TELEFUNKEN Fernseh und Rundfunk GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 90901804.6 | 26.01.1990 | [1991/10] | WO1990EP00143 | Priority number, date | DE19893902948 | 01.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3902948 | [1991/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9009063 | Date: | 09.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0414838 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0414838 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/38] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0414838 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/66 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
H04B1/66 (EP,US);
G10L19/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG EINES SIGNALS | [1991/10] | English: | PROCESS FOR TRANSMITTING A SIGNAL | [1991/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX | [1991/10] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.1990 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 19.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.06.1994
05.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE DOLBY LABORATORIES LICENSING CORPORATION 100 Potrero Avenue San Francisco, CA 94102 / US Opponent's representative Hoffmann, Eckart Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.06.1994
05.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE DOLBY LABORATORIES LICENSING CORPORATION 100 Potrero Avenue San Francisco, CA 94102 / US Opponent's representative Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | ||
Former [1994/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.06.1994
DOLBY LABORATORIES LICENSING CORPORATION 100 Potrero Avenue San Francisco, CA 94102 / US Opponent's representative Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Bahnhofstrasse 103 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | 28.07.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.11.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.12.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.1995 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 20.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 16.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.02.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.04.2000 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 18.07.2003 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.07.2003 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.02.2004 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 25.05.2000 | Appeal received No. T0559/00 | 08.08.2000 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.08.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 08.08.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.08.2002 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2050114 ; | [A]DE3506912 (TELEFUNKEN FERNSEH & RUNDFUNK [DE]) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ACOUSTICS SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, Band. 34, Nr. 5, Oktober 1986 JOHN P. PRINCEN, AND ALAN BERNARD BRADLEY: "Analysis/Synthesis Filter Bank Design Based on Time Domain Aliasing Cancellation ", | Examination | DE2050114 | DE3506912 | EP0251028 | - N.S. Jayant und P. Noll, Digital coding of waveforms, principles and applications to speech and video", Prentice-Hall Inc.; 1984, ISBN 0-13-211913-7, Seiten xi, xii, 104, 105, 170 bis 173, 244, 245, 418, 419, 564 bis 567, 574, 575, 578 und 579. | Opposition | - Y.B. Yu und A.G. Constantinides, "Variable block size and position transform coding", Proceedings of the fourth European Signal Processing Conference, September 1988, Bd.2, Seiten 1011 bis 1013. | - T.F. Quatieri, Jr, "Minimum and mixed phase speech analysis-synthesis by adaptive homomorphic deconvolution", IEEE Transactions on Acoustics, Speecg abd Signal processing, August 1979, B.D. ASSP-27, Nr. 4, Seiten 328 bis 335 | - N.S. Jayant und P. Noll, Digital coding of waveforms, principles and applications to specch and video", Prentice-Hall Inc.; 1984, ISBN 0-13-211913-7, Seiten xi, xii, 104, 105, 170 bis 173, 244, 245, 418, 564 bis 567, 574, 575, 578 und 579. |