EP0461168 - ELECTRONIC IMAGE-REPRODUCING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 D-78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTNACK, Wolfgang Zilleweg 14A D-3167 Burgdorf / DE | [1991/51] | Application number, filing date | 90904272.3 | 28.02.1990 | [1991/51] | WO1990EP00329 | Priority number, date | DE19893906712 | 03.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3906712 | [1991/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9010352 | Date: | 07.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0461168 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0461168 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/12 | [1991/51] | CPC: |
H04N7/015 (EP,US);
H04N7/12 (KR);
H04N19/527 (EP,US);
H04N19/86 (EP,US);
H04N19/98 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/51] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES BILDWIEDERGABEGERÄT | [1991/51] | English: | ELECTRONIC IMAGE-REPRODUCING DEVICE | [1991/51] | French: | APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE DE REPRODUCTION D'IMAGES | [1991/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 19.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 18.01.1995 | DK | 18.01.1995 | NL | 18.01.1995 | AT | 28.02.1995 | CH | 28.02.1995 | LI | 28.02.1995 | LU | 28.02.1995 | SE | 18.04.1995 | [2000/06] |
Former [1998/15] | BE | 18.01.1995 | |
DK | 18.01.1995 | ||
NL | 18.01.1995 | ||
AT | 28.02.1995 | ||
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
SE | 18.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/28] | BE | 18.01.1995 | |
NL | 18.01.1995 | ||
AT | 28.02.1995 | ||
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
SE | 18.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/03] | BE | 18.01.1995 | |
NL | 18.01.1995 | ||
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
SE | 18.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | BE | 18.01.1995 | |
NL | 18.01.1995 | ||
CH | 28.02.1995 | ||
LI | 28.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | BE | 18.01.1995 | |
NL | 18.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/42] | BE | 18.01.1995 | Cited in | International search | WO8702210 [ ] (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]); | WO8704033 [ ] (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP [GB]); | WO8803346 [ ] (THOMSON GRAND PUBLIC [FR]); | US4802005 [ ] (KONDO TETSUJIRO [JP]) | [ ] - Proceedings of the IEEE, Band 73, Nr. 4, April 1985, (New York, US) E. DUBOIS: "The Sampling and Reconstruction of Time-Varying Imagery with Application in Video Systems", seiten 502-522 | [ ] - Beitrag an ein Seminar an das "Institute of Technology" (M.I.T.) (Cambridge, Massachusetts, US) 9-13. Oktober 1988 "Club de Rennes Young Researchers" - Seminar, F. VREESWIJK: " HD-MAC Coding for Broadcasting of High Definition Television Signals", seiten 1-20 | Examination | - Report to a seminar at the "Institute of Technology" (M.I.T.) (Cambridge, Massachusetts, US) 9-13 October 1988 "Club de Rennes Young Researchers" - Seminar, F. Vreeswijk: "HD-MAC coding for broadcasting of high definition television signals", pages 1-20 |