Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.1995 [1995/10] |
15.02.1994 | First examination report | |
21.07.1992 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.09.1992 [1992/37] |
03.05.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.06.1991 [1991/25] |
03.05.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.1991 [1991/25] |