Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9012431 | Global Dossier | 18.10.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33404089 | 04.04.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU649025B | Global Dossier | 12.05.1994 | B2 | AU7431391 | 12.12.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US33404089 | 04.04.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0432227 | Global Dossier | 09.09.1992 | A4 | EP0432227 | 19.06.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33404089 | 04.04.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4973263 | 27.11.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US33404089 | 04.04.1989 |