EP0432227 - ELECTRICAL SPLICE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.1995 [1995/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLATROL, INC. 11055 Roselle Street San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [1991/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIELSEN, Wyn, Y. 3918 La Jolla Village Drive La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [1991/25] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90906494.1 | 03.04.1990 | [1991/25] | WO1990US01793 | Priority number, date | US19890334040 | 04.04.1989 Original published format: US 334040 | [1991/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9012431 | Date: | 18.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0432227 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.10.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/24 | [1991/25] | CPC: |
G05B19/0423 (EP,US);
H01R4/484 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25296 (EP,US);
H01R13/52 (EP,US);
H01R13/64 (EP,US);
H01R4/4821 (EP,US);
H01R4/4852 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/25] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE VERBINDUNGSEINHEIT | [1991/25] | English: | ELECTRICAL SPLICE ASSEMBLY | [1991/25] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE JONCTION ELECTRIQUE | [1991/25] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.1991 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.1991 | Search fee paid | 25.03.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 18.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/10] | 10.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.03.1991 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   25.03.1991 | 25.03.1991 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   25.03.1991 | 25.03.1991 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   25.03.1991 | 25.03.1991 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   25.03.1991 | 25.03.1991 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   25.03.1991 | 25.03.1991 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   25.03.1991 | 25.03.1991 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   25.03.1991 | 25.03.1991 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   25.03.1991 | 25.03.1991 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   25.03.1991 | 25.03.1991 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   25.03.1991 | 25.03.1991 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   25.03.1991 | 25.03.1991 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   25.03.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB190922287 (HIGHFIELD JOHN SOMERVILLE [GB]); | [X]GB477019 (AEG); | [Y]DE2626200 (WAGO KONTAKTTECHNIK GMBH); | [A]FR2448795 (TRILUX LENZE GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]WO8002213 (WELINS PATENTER [SE], et al); | [Y]EP0037758 (LEGRAND SA [FR]); | [A]US4673233 (HERTELENDY CHRIS E [US]); | [A]US4701000 (SUPRONO PAUL W [US]); | [Y]US4768976 (GELATI BRUNO [IT]) | International search | [A]US2780791 (FRANZ MORSCHEL); | [A]US3633148 (THORSMAN OSWALD WILLY) |