Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9015645 | Global Dossier | 27.12.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36417589 | 12.06.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5822690 | Global Dossier | 08.01.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US36417589 | 12.06.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0428694 | Global Dossier | 13.11.1991 | A4 | EP0428694 | 29.05.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36417589 | 12.06.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH04501081 | 27.02.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US36417589 | 12.06.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4928975 | 29.05.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US36417589 | 12.06.1989 |